AL SB198 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of registrars, registrars, reallocation of days a registrar may annually work to another registrar, approval of county commission required, Sec. 17-3-8.1 added
Title
Board of registrars, registrars, reallocation of days a registrar may annually work to another registrar, approval of county commission required, Sec. 17-3-8.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 429 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 428 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 298 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 299 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 428 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 298 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 299 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-131. |
2022-03-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 429 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 299 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |