AL SB198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-171.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-171.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, certificates of title, certain notarization requirements waived, collection of commissions, further provided, issuance of new certificates of title, further provided, Secs. 32-8-3, 32-8-7, 32-8-35, 32-8-43, 32-20-3, 32-20-5, 32-20-23, 32-20-29 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, certificates of title, certain notarization requirements waived, collection of commissions, further provided, issuance of new certificates of title, further provided, Secs. 32-8-3, 32-8-7, 32-8-35, 32-8-43, 32-20-3, 32-20-5, 32-20-23, 32-20-29 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 549 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 548 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 320 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 319 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 548 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 320 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 319 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-171. |
2021-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 549 |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 320 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB163 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 20 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 8 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 8 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 8 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |