AL SB198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hale Co., sheriff, Sheriff Service of Process Serving Fund, created, service of process, further provided for, sheriff may contract for service, fees, disposition of funds
Title
Hale Co., sheriff, Sheriff Service of Process Serving Fund, created, service of process, further provided for, sheriff may contract for service, fees, disposition of funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-310. |
2015-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128 |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1079 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |