AL SB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-383.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-383.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substance database, access by board of nursing authorized for monitoring licensees, Sec. 20-2-214 am'd.
Title
Controlled substance database, access by board of nursing authorized for monitoring licensees, Sec. 20-2-214 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Andrew Jones [R] |
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1021 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Carns motion to Adopt Roll Call 1020 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 625 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Beasley motion to Adopt Roll Call 624 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Carns motion to Adopt Roll Call 1020 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 625 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Beasley motion to Adopt Roll Call 624 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-383. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 625 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |