AL SB185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-371.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-371.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2021 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Title
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2021 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 937 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 166 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Holley motion to Adopt Roll Call 165 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 166 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Holley motion to Adopt Roll Call 165 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-371. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 937 |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 166 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government