AL SB175 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the ReEngage Alabama Grant Program; to provide grant award payments to eligible adult learners; to provide eligibility standards, and to provide for administration by the Alabama Commission on Higher Education; relating to grants for short-term credentials; to establish the Alabama Short-Term Credential Scholarship Program to provide grants to Alabama residents to help them earn short-term credentials; to determine eligible recipients; to establish procedures for administering the program; to set forth the process by which the program will be funded; and to repeal the Alabama Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act commencing with Section 40-18-422, Code of Alabama 1975.
Title
To establish the ReEngage Alabama Grant Program; to provide grant award payments to eligible adult learners; to provide eligibility standards, and to provide for administration by the Alabama Commission on Higher Education; relating to grants for short-term credentials; to establish the Alabama Short-Term Credential Scholarship Program to provide grants to Alabama residents to help them earn short-term credentials; to determine eligible recipients; to establish procedures for administering the program; to set forth the process by which the program will be funded; and to repeal the Alabama Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act commencing with Section 40-18-422, Code of Alabama 1975.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Accede (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt 8ZDLF2-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Accede (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt 8ZDLF2-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Conference Committee on SB175 RHURNM-1 |
2023-05-31 | House | Accede to Conference Committee on SB175 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt 8ZDLF2-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-24 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 8ZDLF2-1 |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-27 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |