AL SB175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Assigned Act No. 2016-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Assigned Act No. 2016-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive bids, public works Transportation Department and other agencies, increase the bid guarantee if Dept. of Transportation is awarding authority, Secs. 23-1-2, 39-2-4 am'd.
Title
Competitive bids, public works Transportation Department and other agencies, increase the bid guarantee if Dept. of Transportation is awarding authority, Secs. 23-1-2, 39-2-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - Ledbetter motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-260. |
2016-04-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-27 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757 |
2016-04-27 | House | Ledbetter motion to Table adopted Roll Call 756 |
2016-04-27 | House | Rogers Amendment Offered |
2016-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-27 | House | Ledbetter motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-27 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 167 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |