AL SB167 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Jobs Act; requirements for approved companies revised
Title
Alabama Jobs Act; requirements for approved companies revised
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 539 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 538 8EEYFFF-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 537 NUID888-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 538 8EEYFFF-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 537 NUID888-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 539 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 538 8EEYFFF-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Givhan 1st Amendment Offered 8EEYFFF-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 537 NUID888-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered NUID888-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute NUID888-1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |