AL SB163 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Reported Out of Committee in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Reported Out of Committee in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize any county, municipality, or governmental entity subject to a countywide civil service system established by a local law to elect by a majority vote of the governing body of the county, municipality, or governmental entity to be exempt from the countywide civil service system for the recruitment and hiring of all employees; to require the county, municipality, or governmental entity to adopt a human resources policy and procedures manual and to notify the director of the countywide civil service system of its decision to withdraw from the system for the recruitment and hiring of employees; and to provide that employees, after a probationary period, would be merit system employees subject to all rights and protections under the countywide civil service system.
Title
To authorize any county, municipality, or governmental entity subject to a countywide civil service system established by a local law to elect by a majority vote of the governing body of the county, municipality, or governmental entity to be exempt from the countywide civil service system for the recruitment and hiring of all employees; to require the county, municipality, or governmental entity to adopt a human resources policy and procedures manual and to notify the director of the countywide civil service system of its decision to withdraw from the system for the recruitment and hiring of employees; and to provide that employees, after a probationary period, would be merit system employees subject to all rights and protections under the countywide civil service system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Adopt FGP655-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Adopt FGP655-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-23 | House | No Recommendation by House County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Adopt FGP655-1 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Carry Over |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |