AL SB160 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expungement of criminal records, authorized for youthful offenders, Sec. 15-27-2.1 added
Title
Expungement of criminal records, authorized for youthful offenders, Sec. 15-27-2.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 867 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 866 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Judiciary Substitute Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |