AL SB160 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State agencies, report to Executive Budget officer re: federal funding required, submission of reports to Joint Fiscal Committee for consideration, recommendations
Title
State agencies, report to Executive Budget officer re: federal funding required, submission of reports to Joint Fiscal Committee for consideration, recommendations
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-438. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1250 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 356 |
2015-06-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 355 |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |