AL SB145 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Foresters, State Board of Registration for, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, diversity in board membership, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Secs. 34-12-4, 34-12-30 am'd. (2010-20277)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foresters, State Board of Registration for, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, diversity in board membership, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Secs. 34-12-4, 34-12-30 am'd. (2010-20277)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 25, 2010
2010-03-25 Assigned Act No. 2010-278.
2010-03-25 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-03-25 Signature Requested
2010-03-25 Enrolled
2010-03-23 Dixon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 545
2010-03-23 Concurrence Requested
2010-02-23 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 376
2010-02-23 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 375
2010-02-23 Hall Amendment Offered
2010-02-23 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-17 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions
2010-02-16 Engrossed
2010-02-11 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 125
2010-02-11 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 124
2010-02-11 Pittman first Substitute Offered
2010-02-11 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-01-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback