AL SB137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Governor's Office of Minority Affairs, name changed to Alabama Office of Minority Affairs, established as a separate state agency, authorized to draft policy recommendations, merit and non-merit staff provided for, technical corrections re name change made to Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee, Secs. 36-13-50, 36-13-51, 36-13-53, 40-9F-38 am'd.
Title
Governor's Office of Minority Affairs, name changed to Alabama Office of Minority Affairs, established as a separate state agency, authorized to draft policy recommendations, merit and non-merit staff provided for, technical corrections re name change made to Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee, Secs. 36-13-50, 36-13-51, 36-13-53, 40-9F-38 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 190 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 189 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 188 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 189 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 188 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from State Government |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 190 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 189 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB199 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 13 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 13 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 13 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9F | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |