AL SB135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosthetists and Orthotists, State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications until October 1, 2011, appointments altered and clarified, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, board members required to be citizens of the state, Secs. 34-25A-5, 34-25A-8 am'd.; Act 2009-300, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20273)
Title
Prosthetists and Orthotists, State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications until October 1, 2011, appointments altered and clarified, applicants for licensure required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, board members required to be citizens of the state, Secs. 34-25A-5, 34-25A-8 am'd.; Act 2009-300, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20273)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Forwarded to | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-145. | |
2010-02-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 100 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 99 | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Beason first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions | |
2010-02-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |