AL SB132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2016-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2016-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, distilleries, sale of liquor at retail by, for off-site consumption authorized, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, distilleries, sale of liquor at retail by, for off-site consumption authorized, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-130. |
2016-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-05 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 491 |
2016-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 321 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 320 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |