AL SB125 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband, authorizing the state, county, or a municipality to grant certain monies for broadband infrastructure, const. amend.
Title
Broadband, authorizing the state, county, or a municipality to grant certain monies for broadband infrastructure, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 187 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 186 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 185 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 186 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 185 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Urban and Rural Development |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 187 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 186 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |