AL SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Voting rights restoration, application requirement eliminated, Board of Pardons and Paroles to determine eligibility to receive Certificate of Eligibility to Register to Vote, eliminate requirement to pay all fines, court costs and fees, Secs. 15-22-36.1, 17-3-31 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting rights restoration, application requirement eliminated, Board of Pardons and Paroles to determine eligibility to receive Certificate of Eligibility to Register to Vote, eliminate requirement to pay all fines, court costs and fees, Secs. 15-22-36.1, 17-3-31 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 635 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 634 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 244 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2021-03-18SenateEngrossed
2021-03-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 635
2021-03-16SenateGivhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 634
2021-03-16SenateGivhan first Substitute Offered
2021-03-16SenateGivhan motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2021-03-16SenateGivhan Amendment Offered
2021-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-23SenateMotion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote
2021-02-23SenateGivhan Amendment Offered
2021-02-23SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2021-02-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152236.1Amended CodeSee Bill Text
17331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB118&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB118-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB118-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210690-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211760-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41662.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646183&VOTE=244&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB118&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=652234&VOTE=634&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=652235&VOTE=635&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback