AL SB109 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes & Offenses, raises maximum age for offenses involving minors & sexually explicit conduct, authorizes punitive damages for victims of those offenses, directs Board of Education to require policies related to those offenses
Title
Crimes & Offenses, raises maximum age for offenses involving minors & sexually explicit conduct, authorizes punitive damages for victims of those offenses, directs Board of Education to require policies related to those offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted MV74H1H-1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |