AL SB107 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2022-158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2022-158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2023, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2023, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 598 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Warren motion to Adopt Roll Call 597 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 427 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 426 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Warren motion to Adopt Roll Call 597 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 427 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 426 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-158. |
2022-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 598 |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 427 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund