AL SB106 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to municipal courts; to require all municipal courts to begin to enter certain information regarding criminal charges into each court's information system by January 1, 2025.
Title
Relating to municipal courts; to require all municipal courts to begin to enter certain information regarding criminal charges into each court's information system by January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |