AL SB105 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Military families, requires school districts operating magnet schools to accept enrollment applications for military children where families have received transfer orders to Alabama military installations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military families, requires school districts operating magnet schools to accept enrollment applications for military children where families have received transfer orders to Alabama military installations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HousePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Education Policy
2020-03-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2020-02-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 103
2020-02-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-02-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback