AL HR60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2020-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2020-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
West, James E., commended
Title
West, James E., commended
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-68. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 250 |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 115 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |