AL HJR99 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on March 9, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on March 9, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taiwan, relation with the United States and State of Alabama, commended
Title
Taiwan, relation with the United States and State of Alabama, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on March 9, 2022. |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-135. |
2022-03-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Rules |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |