AL HJR91 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2018-143.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2018-143.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russellville High School, commended
Title
Russellville High School, commended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-143. |
2018-02-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 385 |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 69 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |