AL HJR89 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CREATING THE ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE TASK FORCE.
Title
CREATING THE ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE TASK FORCE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Adopt 1452Z3-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Adopt 1452Z3-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-23 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Adopt 1452Z3-1 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate RULES 1452Z3-1 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate RULES |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate RULES |
2023-04-19 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed by House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House RULES |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to House RULES |
2023-04-18 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |