AL HJR875 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-38)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-38)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Danner, Bert Willis, death mourned
Title
Danner, Bert Willis, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-392 on 06/07/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-06-01 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-06-01 | Sanderford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-01 | Introduced |