AL HJR62 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 7:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 7:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anthony Robinson, Jr., and Christopher "C.J." Boykins, Jr., Memorial, portion of United States Highway 43 in Marengo County, named
Title
Anthony Robinson, Jr., and Christopher "C.J." Boykins, Jr., Memorial, portion of United States Highway 43 in Marengo County, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-365. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-04-02 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |