AL HJR556 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pena-Esclusa, Alejandro, commended; invited to address joint session of the Legislature (2010-20693)
Title
Pena-Esclusa, Alejandro, commended; invited to address joint session of the Legislature (2010-20693)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Guin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-444. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-23 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Buskey motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Rules Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |