AL HJR51 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Appreciation Day, February 6, 2014, designated
Title
Military Appreciation Day, February 6, 2014, designated
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014. |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-36. |
2014-02-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |