AL HJR51 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Memorial Parkway, portion of U. S. Highway 231, currently Montgomery Highway, that runs inside Ross Clark Circle to U. S. HIghway 431 and Oates Street junction in Dothan, in Houston County, named
Title
Veterans Memorial Parkway, portion of U. S. Highway 231, currently Montgomery Highway, that runs inside Ross Clark Circle to U. S. HIghway 431 and Oates Street junction in Dothan, in Houston County, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012. | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned Act No. 2012-38. | |
2012-02-21 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-02-21 | Signature Requested | |
2012-02-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-02-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-02-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-14 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-14 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |