AL HJR50 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:33 a.m. on August 26, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rains, Paul Douglas, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rains, Paul Douglas, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:33 a.m. on August 26, 2016.
2016-08-26HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-467.
2016-08-26HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-08-26HouseEnrolled
2016-08-26SenateSignature Requested
2016-08-26HousePassed Second House
2016-08-25SenatePittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-25SenateReceived in Senate
2016-08-24HouseMcMillan motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-24HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback