AL HJR37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rogers, Johnny, professional achievement, commended
Title
Rogers, Johnny, professional achievement, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-30. |
2018-01-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on January 25, 2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-23 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |