AL HJR335 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hooper, Perry Oliver, Sr., death mourned
Title
Hooper, Perry Oliver, Sr., death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-245. |
2016-04-28 | House | JS |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2016-04-26 | House | Ford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced |