AL HJR32 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:51 a.m. on February 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:51 a.m. on February 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collins, William Montgomery, Sr. and wife Euber Roberts, death mourned
Title
Collins, William Montgomery, Sr. and wife Euber Roberts, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:51 a.m. on February 25, 2021. |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-31. |
2021-02-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | Rowe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |