AL HJR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter Brenden Alexander Pierce Highway, portion of Highway 75 in Allgood, named
Title
Firefighter Brenden Alexander Pierce Highway, portion of Highway 75 in Allgood, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 11:57 a.m. on March 12, 2020. |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-71. |
2020-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |