AL HJR30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-26 on 01/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-26 on 01/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Howell, David Claude, inducted into the Washington County Hall of Fame, posthumously recognized
Title
Howell, David Claude, inducted into the Washington County Hall of Fame, posthumously recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-26 on 01/30/2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on January 25, 2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-23 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |