AL HJR29 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Forwarded to Governor on September 16, 2015 at 9:12 p.m. on September 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dean, William, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dean, William, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseForwarded to Governor on September 16, 2015 at 9:12 p.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-546.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16HouseEnrolled
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-16HousePassed Second House
2015-09-16SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateReported from Rules
2015-09-14SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2015-09-11HouseJohnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-11HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback