AL HJR234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Acted on by Rules as Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Acted on by Rules as Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
McCovery, Jeremy, commended
Title
McCovery, Jeremy, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Acted on by Rules as Favorable |
2014-03-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-195 on 04/02/2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |