AL HJR225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Rules first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Rules first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Miller, Mary Beth, death mourned
Title
Miller, Mary Beth, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Rules first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on May 9, 2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Conference Committee on HJR225 2013RS first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-206. |
2013-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-02 | House | Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference Report |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Voice Vote P&PO appoints Smith, Holley and Keahey |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2013-04-23 | House | Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 683 House appoints Lee, Butler and Grimsley |
2013-04-23 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules Amendment Offered |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules 1 amendment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2013-04-09 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |