AL HJR221 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Forwarded to Governor on May 21, 2015 at 2:33 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Forwarded to Governor on May 21, 2015 at 2:33 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
James "Jimmy" Hopper Highway, portion of Highway 75 between Rainesville and Fyffe, Alabama, named
Title
James "Jimmy" Hopper Highway, portion of Highway 75 between Rainesville and Fyffe, Alabama, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 21, 2015 at 2:33 p.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-250 on 05/27/2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-05-14 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |