AL HJR197 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cauthen, Steven, commended
Title
Cauthen, Steven, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2015-05-21 | Senate | |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 21, 2015 at 2:33 p.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-248. |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-05-12 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |