AL HJR100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-05 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on May 5, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-05 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on May 5, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mancarella, Jennica Kimberly McMillan, death mourned
Title
Mancarella, Jennica Kimberly McMillan, death mourned
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on May 5, 2020. |
2020-05-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-112. |
2020-05-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-05 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2020-03-05 | House | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced |