AL HB9 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to correctional incentive time; to amend Section 14-9-41, as last amended by Act 2022-322, 2022 Regular Session, Code of Alabama 1975, to reduce the amount of correctional incentive time a prisoner receives; to require a prisoner to remain in a certain classification for a longer period of time before moving up to a higher classification; to provide for additional circumstances in which a prisoner may be required to forfeit his or her correctional incentive time; and to require the Department of Corrections to provide annual reports to the Legislature, the Governor, and the Attorney General regarding correctional incentive time.
Title
Relating to correctional incentive time; to amend Section 14-9-41, as last amended by Act 2022-322, 2022 Regular Session, Code of Alabama 1975, to reduce the amount of correctional incentive time a prisoner receives; to require a prisoner to remain in a certain classification for a longer period of time before moving up to a higher classification; to provide for additional circumstances in which a prisoner may be required to forfeit his or her correctional incentive time; and to require the Department of Corrections to provide annual reports to the Legislature, the Governor, and the Attorney General regarding correctional incentive time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security Z4UYKR-1 |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security SYT175-1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-01-20 | House | Prefiled |