AL HB88 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Funeral Service, Board of, substantially revised relating to board and operation of funeral establishments and mortuary service, application, renewal, and inspection fees increased, fines for violations increased, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-20, 34-13-22, 34-13-23, 34-13-26, 34-13-50, 34-13-51, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-70, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-74, 34-13-90, 34-13-94, 34-13-111, 34-13-113, 34-13-114, 34-13-115, 34-13-116, 34-13-120, 34-13-130 am'd.; Secs. 34-13-28, 34-13-150, 34-13-151, 34-13-152 repealed (2011-20127)
Title
Funeral Service, Board of, substantially revised relating to board and operation of funeral establishments and mortuary service, application, renewal, and inspection fees increased, fines for violations increased, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-20, 34-13-22, 34-13-23, 34-13-26, 34-13-50, 34-13-51, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-70, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-74, 34-13-90, 34-13-94, 34-13-111, 34-13-113, 34-13-114, 34-13-115, 34-13-116, 34-13-120, 34-13-130 am'd.; Secs. 34-13-28, 34-13-150, 34-13-151, 34-13-152 repealed (2011-20127)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 717 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 716 | |
2011-05-05 | Insurance first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |