AL HB631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Governor at 10:49 a.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Governor at 10:49 a.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public waterways, Conservation and Natural Resources Dept, establishment of Alabama State Reservoir Management Development Program for reservoir mangement including invasive species, add'l registration fees on boats, Secs. 33-5-6, 33-5-10, 33-5-17 am'd.
Title
Public waterways, Conservation and Natural Resources Dept, establishment of Alabama State Reservoir Management Development Program for reservoir mangement including invasive species, add'l registration fees on boats, Secs. 33-5-6, 33-5-10, 33-5-17 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Crawford motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1122 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1296 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1295 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1294 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 952 (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - HBIR: Crawford motion to Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1296 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1295 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1294 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 952 (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - HBIR: Crawford motion to Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:49 a.m. on May 6, 2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-447. |
2021-05-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Brown (C) and Stringer intended to vote "Nay" |
2021-05-06 | House | Crawford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1122 |
2021-05-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1296 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sessions motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1295 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 952 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |