AL HB62 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, state, county, municipal, and volunteer fire departments, license tags, fees to be set by Revenue Department, issuance fee, replacement tags, transfers, Revenue Department to retain fees, Sec. 40-12-250 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, state, county, municipal, and volunteer fire departments, license tags, fees to be set by Revenue Department, issuance fee, replacement tags, transfers, Revenue Department to retain fees, Sec. 40-12-250 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-689 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1164 | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90 | |
2010-01-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety |