AL HB554 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colleges, state four-year, veterans, children of deceased and disabled veterans, comprehensive transition and postsecondary programs for children of disabled veterans with intellectual disabilities, tuition reimbursement provided for, Sec. 31-6-2.1 added; Secs. 31-6-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colleges, state four-year, veterans, children of deceased and disabled veterans, comprehensive transition and postsecondary programs for children of disabled veterans with intellectual disabilities, tuition reimbursement provided for, Sec. 31-6-2.1 added; Secs. 31-6-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1259 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1258 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 879 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 878 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - HBIR: Rich motion to Adopt Roll Call 877 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
2021-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-444.
2021-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2021-04-29HouseEnrolled
2021-04-29HousePassed Second House
2021-04-29SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1259
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2021-04-15HouseEngrossed
2021-04-15HouseCosponsors Added
2021-04-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 879
2021-04-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 878
2021-04-15HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2021-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB554&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB554-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB554-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB554-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212479-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42594.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42626.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42853.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658963&VOTE=880&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658953&VOTE=877&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB554&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658959&VOTE=878&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658960&VOTE=879&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662493&VOTE=1258&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB554&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662503&VOTE=1259&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback