AL HB534 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., gasoline tax, distrib. municipalities, deleted, Act 393, 1971 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Calhoun Co., gasoline tax, distrib. municipalities, deleted, Act 393, 1971 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 49 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 49 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-378. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1152 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 940 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |