AL HB532 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., business licenses, issuance of required for door-to-door commercial sales, license fee, penalties, Secs. 45-8-70.01, 45-8-241 am'd.
Title
Calhoun Co., business licenses, issuance of required for door-to-door commercial sales, license fee, penalties, Secs. 45-8-70.01, 45-8-241 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-377. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1150 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 534 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 533 |
2013-04-16 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |