AL HB521 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:44 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:44 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health, health care facilities, one caregiver or visitor to patients or residents to be allowed, subject to reasonable restrictions
Title
Health, health care facilities, one caregiver or visitor to patients or residents to be allowed, subject to reasonable restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Gudger motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1298 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Wood (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1063 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Wood (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1063 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Gudger motion to Accede Roll Call 1175 P&PO appoints Gudger, Givhan and Hatcher (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Wood (D) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 990 House appoints Wood (D), Gray and Mooney (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1052 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 1051 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1050 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1049 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 670 (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 669 (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Wood (D) motion to Adopt Roll Call 668 (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Wood (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1063 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Wood (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1063 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Gudger motion to Accede Roll Call 1175 P&PO appoints Gudger, Givhan and Hatcher (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Wood (D) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 990 House appoints Wood (D), Gray and Mooney (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1052 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 1051 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1050 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1049 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 670 (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 669 (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Wood (D) motion to Adopt Roll Call 668 (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:44 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-470. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-04 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Gudger motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1298 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Wood (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1063 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference Committee on HB521 2021RS first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference Report |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Gudger motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1175 P&PO appoints Gudger, Givhan and Hatcher |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Wood (D) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 990 House appoints Wood (D), Gray and Mooney |
2021-04-27 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1052 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1051 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reed Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1050 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Gudger Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Gudger motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-07 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-07 | House | Hanes intended to vote "Nay" |
2021-04-07 | House | Scott and Alexander intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 670 |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 669 |
2021-04-07 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed